LA HB165 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Law (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Law (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Sherman Mack [R] | Rep. Tony Bacala [R] | Rep. John Bagneris [D] | Rep. Stephen Dwight [R] |
Rep. Lowell Hazel [R] | Rep. Frank Howard [R] | Rep. Joseph Marino [I] | Rep. Steve Pylant [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 165 ADOPT (#1382) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 165 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1393) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 165 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#850) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#688) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#204) (Y: 81 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 165 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1393) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 165 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#850) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#688) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#204) (Y: 81 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 677. |
2018-05-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2018-05-18 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2018-05-18 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2018-05-16 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Claitor, Martiny, and Luneau. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2018-05-09 | House | House conferees appointed: Mack, Hazel, and Hodges. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2018-05-09 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/09/18. |
2018-05-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/02/18. |
2018-03-26 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-22 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-02-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-02-26 | House | Prefiled. |