LA HB165 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to fees collected by the Louisiana State Board of Medical Examiners (EG +$1,042,400 SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to fees collected by the Louisiana State Board of Medical Examiners (EG +$1,042,400 SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. John Anders [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 165 FINAL PASSAGE (#55) (Y: 53 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | House | Notice removed |
2015-05-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/20/2015. |
2015-05-14 | House | Notice given. |
2015-04-28 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2015-04-27 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 53, nays 40. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending. |
2015-04-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/27/2015. |
2015-04-22 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported favorably (13-4). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2015-03-27 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/27/2015. |
2015-03-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2015-03-25 | House | Prefiled. |