LA HB165 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes changes to the oversight and adoption of updates to the state uniform construction code
Title
Makes changes to the oversight and adoption of updates to the state uniform construction code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2014-02-14 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/14/2014. |
2014-02-13 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2014-02-13 | House | Prefiled. |