LA HB159 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a prestige license plate for the March of Dimes
Title
Creates a prestige license plate for the March of Dimes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 159 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#504) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 159 FINAL PASSAGE (#378) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - House Vote on HB 159, FINAL PASSAGE (#12) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 159 FINAL PASSAGE (#378) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - House Vote on HB 159, FINAL PASSAGE (#12) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2013. |
2013-05-30 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 76. |
2013-05-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-22 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-21 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2013-05-16 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on May 21, 2013. |
2013-05-14 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2013-04-15 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/15/2013. |
2013-04-10 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. |
2013-04-09 | House | Reported favorably (18-0) (Local and Consent). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2013-03-22 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2013. |
2013-03-20 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2013-03-19 | House | Prefiled. |