LA HB115 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-11 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-11 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes certain instructional requirements for students in kindergarten through third grade
Title
Removes certain instructional requirements for students in kindergarten through third grade
Sponsors
Rep. John Wyble [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-02-23 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2024. |
2024-02-21 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-02-21 | House | Prefiled. |