LA HB105 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows certain Type 1 charter schools to act as their own local education agencies (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Allows certain Type 1 charter schools to act as their own local education agencies (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-04-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/18. |
2018-04-13 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported favorably (11-4). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-02-23 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2018. |
2018-02-21 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-02-21 | House | Prefiled. |