LA HB1011 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the adjustment and settlement of first-party motor vehicle total losses
Title
Provides relative to the adjustment and settlement of first-party motor vehicle total losses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 1011, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1759) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1011, FINAL PASSAGE (#1699) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1011, FINAL PASSAGE (#1153) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1011, FINAL PASSAGE (#1699) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1011, FINAL PASSAGE (#1153) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-07-08 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1032. | |
2010-06-20 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-18 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-18 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 86, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2010-06-17 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/18/2010. | |
2010-06-16 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-16 | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-11 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-10 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-09 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-06-07 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2010-06-04 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-06-03 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-27 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/3/2010. | |
2010-05-26 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-25 | Reported with amendments (8-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-19 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2010-03-19 | Prefiled. |