KY SB75 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 122)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 122)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 121.180 to create a single threshold of $3,000 for campaign finance reports; require state executive committees that establish a building fund account to make quarterly reports; change the date for executive committees and caucus campaign committees to file reports from five days after the 30th day following a primary and regular election to January 31 and July 31; amend KRS 121.150 to increase anonymous and cash contribution limits to $100, and individual contribution limits to $2,000 as indexed for inflation; increase individual contribution limit to $5,000 per year to the state executive committee of a political party; allow contributions of $5,000 per year to subdivisions and affiliates of political parties; make those contribution limits not applicable to contributions to a state executive committee's building fund account; increase the contribution limit to caucus campaign committees to $5,000; allow married couples to make a contribution with one check that reflects the combined individual contribution limits of each individual spouse for all elections in a calendar year; amend KRS 121.230 to conform; create a new section of KRS Chapter 121 to allow the executive committees of political parties to establish building fund accounts and specify permissible and prohibited uses of funds; amend KRS 121.025 and 121.035 to specify that prohibitions on corporate contributions do not prevent a corporation from contributing to a state executive committee's political party building fund account; amend KRS 6.767 to add a definition for "accept" that specifies the time when a contribution is accepted.
Title
AN ACT relating to campaign finance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 122) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | passed 52-43 |
2017-03-14 | House | floor amendments (1) and (3) ruled out of order |
2017-03-14 | House | 3rd reading |
2017-03-07 | House | floor amendments (2) and (3) filed |
2017-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 8, 2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-06 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2017-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-21 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | received in House |
2017-02-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 27-10 with Committee Substitute |
2017-02-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 15, 2017 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2017-02-14 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-02-14 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-02-13 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | introduced in Senate |