KY SB64 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 17)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 17)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 65 to provide definitions, authorize any public agency to establish a peer support counseling program, and provide for confidentiality of communications within a peer support counseling program.
Title
AN ACT relating to peer counseling for public safety employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 243 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 RSN# 1987 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 RSN# 1987 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 17) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-10 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-10 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 |
2022-03-03 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 04, 2022 |
2022-03-03 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-02 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2022-02-02 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-02 | House | received in House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Floor Amendment (1) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2022-01-27 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 01, 2022 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-01-26 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-18 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2022-01-08 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Charter County Government
Cities
Consolidated Local Governments
Counties
Counties, Urban
Emergency Medical Services
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Local Government
Mental Health
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County
Cities
Consolidated Local Governments
Counties
Counties, Urban
Emergency Medical Services
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Local Government
Mental Health
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County