KY SB55 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 126)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 126)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 39B to permit interstate mutual aid agreements for emergency responses; provide for the recognition of certain credentials of emergency responders from other states; provide for certain civil immunity.
Title
AN ACT relating to emergencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 126) | |
2012-03-30 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-03-30 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2012-03-30 | passed 37-0 | |
2012-03-30 | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-30 | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-27 | received in Senate | |
2012-03-27 | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-22 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 27, 2012 | |
2012-03-22 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-21 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-19 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-30 | to Judiciary (H) | |
2012-01-27 | received in House | |
2012-01-27 | passed 32-0 with floor amendment (2) | |
2012-01-27 | floor amendment (1) withdrawn | |
2012-01-27 | Committee Substitute withdrawn | |
2012-01-27 | 3rd reading | |
2012-01-26 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 27, 2012 | |
2012-01-24 | floor amendment (2) filed | |
2012-01-20 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2012-01-20 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-01-19 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-01-03 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | |
2012-01-03 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB55.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB55/bill.doc |