KY SB48 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 124)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 124)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 12.020 to remove the Office of the Ombudsman and Administrative Review and the Office of the Inspector from the Office of the Secretary and place them in the Cabinet for Health and Family Services as individual agencies; dissolve the Department for Income Support, the Department for Family Resource Centers and Volunteer Services, and the Office for Children with Special Health Care Needs; and place the Disability Determination Services program and Serve Kentucky within the Education and Labor Cabinet; amend KRS 13B.020 to remove disability determination hearings from the Department for Income Support and give the responsibility of disability determination hearings to the Education and Labor Cabinet; amend KRS 15.055 to remove the Cabinet for Health and Family Services from promulgating administrative regulations in this section and designating the Office of the Attorney General as the agency in charge of promulgating administrative regulations and publication of delinquent child support obligors; amend KRS 194A.030 to remove the Office of the Ombudsman and Administrative Review the Office of Inspector General from the Office of the Secretary, establish them each as their own entity within the Cabinet, and list their duties; place the Office for Children with Special Health Care Needs within the Department for Public Health; dissolve the Department for Family Resource Centers and Volunteer Services and place that jurisdiction within the Department for Community Based Services; dissolve the Department for Income Support; remove guardian services from the Department for Aging and Independent Living and place those services within the Department for Community Based Services; amend KRS 197.105 to remove the Cabinet from receiving deducted wages from child support and allow the Office of Attorney General to be paid those wages; amend KRS 194A.120 to remove the Office for Children with Special Health Care Needs; amend KRS 194A.624 to remove a representative from the Office for Children with Special Health Care Needs from the advisory council on Autism Spectrum Disorders; repeal, reenact, and amend KRS 205.710 as a new section of KRS Chapter 15 to change definitions to remove the Cabinet from being in charge of administering the child support program and give that responsibility to the Attorney General; repeal, reenact, and amend KRS 205.712 as a new section of KRS Chapter 15 to remove the jurisdiction of child support enforcement from the Department for Income Support and give that jurisdiction and responsibility to the Office of the Attorney General; repeal, reenact, and amend the following statutes as new sections in KRS Chapter 15: KRS 205.713, 205.720, 205.721, 205.725, 205.730, 205.735, 205,745, 205.750, 205.752, 205.755, 205.765, 205.767, 205.768, 205.7685, 205.769, 205.7695, 205.770, 205.772, 205.774, 205.776, 205.778, 205.7785, 205.780, 205.785, 205.792, 205.793, 205.795, 205.796, 205.7965, 205.798, 205.800, 205.802, 341.412, 405.411, 405.430, 405.435, 405.450, 405.460, 405.463, 405.465, 405.467, 405.480, 405.490, 405.520, 407.5102, 402.5201, 407.5308, 407.5310, 407.5602, 407.5703, 407.5704, 407.5705, and 407.5708 to conform; repeal and reenact KRS 205.715, 205.732, 205.766, 205.782, and 205.790 as new sections of KRS Chapter 15; amend KRS 151B.015 to place the Disability Determination Services program and Serve Kentucky under the jurisdiction of the Education and Labor Cabinet; amend KRS 151B.212 to remove a representative from the Department for Income Support from the Employment First Council and add to the council a representative from the Education and Labor Cabinet; amend KRS 207.200 to conform; repeal KRS 194A. 570 and reenact as a new section of KRS Chapter 151B and amend to establish Serve Kentucky in the Education and Labor Cabinet and to remove Serve Kentucky from the Cabinet for Health and Family Services; repeal and reenact 194A.572, 194A.575, and 194A.578 as a new chapter of KRS 151B; amend KRS 403.212, 405.405, 407.5201, 45A.550, 314.077, 403.090, 405.500, 205.172, 205.173, 205.191, 405.470, 131.672, 205.990, 70.325, 205.992 to conform; require the CHFS task force to continue through the interim of 2023; require the Department for Medicaid Services, Aging and Independent Living, and Behavioral Health, Developmental and Intellectual Disabilities to work together to identify and eliminate redundancies and barriers to administering Medicaid waivers; require the Office of Human Resource Management and the Personnel Cabinet to work together to identify systemic barriers; remove the Disability Determination Services program from the Cabinet for Health and Family Services and place it within the Education and Labor Cabinet; remove the Division of Adult Guardianship from the Department for Aging and Independent Living and place it within the Department for Community Based Services.
Title
AN ACT relating to state government operations.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Meredith [R] | Sen. Julie Raque Adams [R] | Sen. Danny Carroll [R] | Sen. Rick Girdler [R] |
Sen. Steve West [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2623 (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 240 (Y: 80 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, sfa1 RSN# 2489 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 240 (Y: 80 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, sfa1 RSN# 2489 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | Senate | became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 124) |
2023-03-27 | Senate | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2023-03-16 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2023-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-15 | Senate | passed 30-6 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendment (1), and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in Committee Substitute (1), House Floor Amendment (1), and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-03-15 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2023-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 80-20 with Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendment (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-03-13 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2023-03-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-09 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-03-03 | House | to Families & Children (H) |
2023-02-23 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-23 | House | received in House |
2023-02-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2023-02-17 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2023-02-16 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2023-02-16 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2023-02-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 16, 2023 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-02-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | to Families & Children (S) |
2023-01-06 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Aged Persons and Aging
Attorney General
Children and Minors
Courts, Circuit
Courts, District
Courts, Family
Crimes and Punishments
Disabilities and the Disabled
Economic Development
Guardians
Reorganization
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Workforce
Aged Persons and Aging
Attorney General
Children and Minors
Courts, Circuit
Courts, District
Courts, Family
Crimes and Punishments
Disabilities and the Disabled
Economic Development
Guardians
Reorganization
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Workforce