KY SB37 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 136)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 136)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 315.0351 to add that pharmacist in charge of an out-of-state pharmacy is required to be licensed in the Commonwealth.
Title
AN ACT relating to pharmacists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Motion to move the previous question RSN# 2727 (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 342 (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2728 (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 227 (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa1 RSN# 2512 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 342 (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2728 (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 227 (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa1 RSN# 2512 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 136) |
2023-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-29 | House | received in Senate |
2023-03-29 | Senate | passed 80-15 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | veto overridden |
2023-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2023-03-29 | Senate | taken from Rules |
2023-03-29 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2023-03-29 | Senate | received in House |
2023-03-29 | House | passed 29 -7 |
2023-03-29 | House | veto overridden |
2023-03-29 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2023-03-29 | House | to Rules (S) |
2023-03-29 | House | received in Senate |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Vetoed |
2023-03-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2023-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-13 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-3 |
2023-03-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-09 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2023-03-03 | House | to Health Services (H) |
2023-02-28 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-28 | House | received in House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-2 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2023-02-23 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 28, 2023 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | returned to Health Services (S) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | 1st reading |
2023-02-21 | Senate | taken from Health Services (S) |
2023-01-05 | Senate | to Health Services (S) |
2023-01-04 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-01-04 | Senate | introduced in Senate |