KY SB30 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 81)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 81)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 365 to define "automatic renewal," "automatic renewal offer terms," "clear and conspicuous," "consumer," and "continuous service,"; require businesses to present automatic renewal or continuous service offer terms clearly and conspicuously to consumers before purchase; require businesses to obtain the consumer's consent before charging the consumer; require businesses to provide an acknowledgment that includes the terms, the cancellation policy, and information regarding how to cancel in a manner that can be retained by the consumer; require businesses to provide consumers with an easy-to-use mechanism for cancellation; require businesses to provide users who purchase in one medium the opportunity to terminate in the same medium, including online termination; require businesses to provide a notice regarding material term changes prior to implementation; exempt certain businesses and services; allow the Attorney General to bring an action for injunctive and monetary relief; and exempt contracts entered into prior to the effective date; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2024.
Title
AN ACT relating to the termination of automatic renewal offers and continuous service offers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2622 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 232 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa3 RSN# 2527 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 232 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa3 RSN# 2527 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 81) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2023-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-15 | Senate | passed 35 -0 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-13 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-07 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2023-03-02 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-02 | House | received in House |
2023-03-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35 -0 with Floor Amendment (3) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2) withdrawn |
2023-02-28 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2023-02-28 | Senate | floor amendment (3) filed |
2023-02-24 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2023-02-22 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 24, 2023 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-02-21 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed |
2023-02-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2023-01-05 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2023-01-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-01-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |