KY SB224 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 140)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 140)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 67A.360 to define "surviving spouse" for purposes of surviving spouse benefits under the urban-county government police and fire pension fund; modify the name of the fund to be gender neutral; make a conforming amendment; amend KRS 67A.345, 67A.370, and 67A.655 to conform due to changing the name of the urban-county government police and fire pension fund; amend KRS 67A.430 to provide that salary shall be credited to an urban-county government police and fire pension fund member's account for periods when the member's salary is reduced due to receipt of worker's compensation provided the member makes the appropriate employee contributions on the salary that would have been paid; require the urban-county government to make employer contributions on the salary credited if the member elects to make contributions; amend KRS 67A.460 to prohibit a retired urban-county government police and fire pension fund who has retired on disability to revert back to a service retirement; amend KRS 67A.480 to require certification of occupational disability by licensed physicians hired by the urban-county government police and fire pension in situations where the member is applying for occupational disability benefits; amend KRS 67A.320 to authorize the mayor with consent of the legislative body to appoint members to the closed city employees' pension plan for elected positions on the board if no members of the closed plan are available or willing to serve on the fund; RETROACTIVE; EMERGENCY; EFFECTIVE July 1, 2022.
Title
AN ACT relating to retirement funds of urban-county governments and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 495 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2125 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2125 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 140) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 |
2022-03-30 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | returned to Rules |
2022-03-29 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-24 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-03-22 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2022-03-16 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-16 | House | received in House |
2022-03-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 15, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2022-02-28 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Cities
Counties
Effective Dates, Emergency
Local Government
Local Mandate
Retirement and Pensions
Retroactive Legislation
Counties
Effective Dates, Emergency
Local Government
Local Mandate
Retirement and Pensions
Retroactive Legislation