KY SB18 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - signed by Governor (KY Acts Ch. 200)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 344.030 to include within the definition of "reasonable accommodation" accommodations made for pregnancy, childbirth, and related medical conditions; define "related medical condition"; amend KRS 344.040 to make it unlawful for an employer to fail to accommodate an employee affected by pregnancy, childbirth, or a related medical condition; require employers to provide notice to all employees regarding the right to be free from discrimination for pregnancy, childbirth, and related medical conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to pregnancy-related accommodations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 389 (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 , sfa 1, sfta 2 RSN# 838 (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09Senatesigned by Governor (KY Acts Ch. 200)
2019-03-28Senatedelivered to Governor
2019-03-28Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-28Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-28Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-28House3rd reading, passed 87-5
2019-03-13Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2019-03-12Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 13, 2019
2019-03-12Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-06Housereturned to Judiciary (H)
2019-03-06House1st reading
2019-03-06Housetaken from Judiciary (H)
2019-03-01Houseposted in committee
2019-02-26Houseto Judiciary (H)
2019-02-25Housereceived in House
2019-02-22Senate3rd reading, passed 25-7 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendments (1) and (2-title)
2019-02-21Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute and floor amendment (2-title) filed
2019-02-21Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2019-02-19Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2019
2019-02-15Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-14Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-01-11Senateto Judiciary (S)
2019-01-08Senateintroduced in Senate
2018-08-17SenatePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback