KY SB168 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 17)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 17)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 43.050 and 91A.040 to allow a special audit or examination of a city government or its agencies or departments to avoid a duplicative repository of audit records at the LRC; allow the Auditor to bill the city for the actual expense of the audit or examination conducted.
Title
AN ACT relating to municipal audits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 17) |
2016-03-22 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-22 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-03-21 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-1 |
2016-03-17 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 21, 2016 |
2016-03-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-11 | House | posted in committee |
2016-03-07 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2016-03-03 | House | received in House |
2016-03-02 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-6 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 2, 2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-24 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-02-11 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | introduced in Senate |