KY SB124 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-28 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 16)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-28 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 16)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 186.450 to provide that motor vehicle instruction permit holders are not required to be accompanied by a person who is at least 21 years of age in the seat beside them when being supervised by a driver training instructor affiliated with a driver training school or a public or nonpublic secondary school.
Title
AN ACT relating to motor vehicle operator's licenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Buford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 16) | |
2012-03-20 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-03-20 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2012-03-19 | received in Senate | |
2012-03-16 | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 | |
2012-03-14 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 16, 2012 | |
2012-03-14 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-13 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-03-09 | posted in committee | |
2012-03-05 | to Transportation (H) | |
2012-03-01 | received in House | |
2012-02-29 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-28 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 29, 2012 | |
2012-02-16 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-15 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-01 | to Transportation (S) | |
2012-01-30 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB124.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB124/bill.doc |