KY SB106 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 35)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 35)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 317A.010 to define "blow drying services" and "limited beauty salon"; amend KRS 317A.050 to establish who may be licensed to perform blow drying services in a licensed limited beauty salon; create accompanying fees; amend KRS 317A.062 to set various fees for a license to conduct blow drying services and a license to operate a limited beauty salon.
Title
AN ACT relating to blow drying services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 343 (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 423 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 423 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 423 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 423 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 35) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-19 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-19 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 86-1 |
2018-03-15 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 16, 2018 |
2018-03-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-03-09 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-13 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2018-02-09 | House | received in House |
2018-02-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 8, 2018 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | introduced in Senate |