KY SB10 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on March 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-28 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 146)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 7 to establish a Commission on Race and Access to Opportunity; define "commission"; set forth the membership of the commission; authorize the authority to hold monthly meetings, seek comment and testimony, and provide research driven policy proposals; and require the commission to publish an annual report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the creation of a Commission on Race and Access to Opportunity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1725 (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 271 (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 270 (Y: 67 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1570 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-28Senatebecame law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 146)
2021-03-16Senatedelivered to Governor
2021-03-16Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2021-03-16Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2021-03-15SenateBill passed 27-9
2021-03-15SenateSenate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and House floor amendment (1)
2021-03-12Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) for Monday, March 15, 2021
2021-03-12Senateto Rules (S)
2021-03-12Senatereceived in Senate
2021-03-11House3rd reading, passed 65-24 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1)
2021-03-11Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute , floor amendment (2) filed to bill
2021-03-05Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 11, 2021
2021-03-05House2nd reading, to Rules
2021-03-04Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2021-03-03Houseposted in committee
2021-03-01Houseto State Government (H)
2021-02-25Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-02-25Housereceived in House
2021-02-24Senate3rd reading, passed 35-1 with Committee Substitute
2021-02-23Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2021-02-22Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 23, 2021
2021-02-11Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2021-02-10Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2021-02-02Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2021-01-13Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-01-13Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback