KY SB1 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch.41)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch.41)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a new section of KRS Chapter 164 to establish the endowed research fund to be administered by the Council on Postsecondary Education (CPE) for the purposes of funding research consortiums between two or more public universities; provides that the fund shall consist of appropriations, federal funds, and other proceeds made available to the fund; provides that the funds shall not lapse; provides that there shall be five consortium accounts within the fund that shall each be assigned to a unique research consortium selected by CPE; provides that CPE shall solicit, accept, and review applications from research consortiums between two or more public universities to determine five research consortiums eligible to receive seed funding for a term of five years; creates a review process to determine eligibility for funding through the fund; directs CPE to fill vacancies when a research consortium is no longer eligible to receive funding through the fund; directs CPE to promulgate administrative regulations to administer this section; and directs CPE to select the Kentucky Spinal Cord and Head Injury Research Trust as one of the initial five research consortiums by February 1, 2025; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to the endowed research fund and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 393 (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2942 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2942 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch.41) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-27 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-27 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 86-0 |
2024-03-25 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-25 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-13 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-03-13 | House | 2nd reading |
2024-03-13 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-03-12 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-03-12 | House | 1st reading |
2024-03-12 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-03-06 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-02-29 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-29 | House | received in House |
2024-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0-1 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 28, 2024 |
2024-02-23 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Appropriations
Education, Higher
State Agencies
Universities and Colleges
Appropriations
Education, Higher
State Agencies
Universities and Colleges