KY HR151 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - 3rd reading, adopted 97-0 with committee amendment (1)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - 3rd reading, adopted 97-0 with committee amendment (1)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Urge the University of Kentucky and Kentucky State University to research the decline of Kentucky's honey bee population.
Title
Urge the University of Kentucky and Kentucky State University to research the decline of Kentucky's honey bee population.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | 3rd reading, adopted 97-0 with committee amendment (1) |
2014-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 4, 2014 |
2014-02-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-26 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with committee amendment (1) |
2014-02-25 | House | posting waived |
2014-02-24 | House | to Agriculture & Small Business (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | introduced in House |