KY HB80 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-27 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-27 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to permit an enrollee in a home and community-based services waiver program to make a direct purchase of all necessary medical devices, equipment, and supplies; require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to promulgate an administrative regulation to implement the section.
Title
AN ACT relating to purchases by enrollees in a home and community-based services waiver program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2013-02-26 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-25 | House | returned to Health & Welfare (H) |
2013-02-25 | House | 1st reading |
2013-02-25 | House | taken from Health & Welfare (H) |
2013-02-20 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-06 | House | posted in committee |
2013-01-09 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2013-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB80.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB80/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB80/FN.doc |