KY HB687 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 106)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 106)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate funds for the payment of claims against the Commonwealth; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to authorizing the payment of certain claims against the state which have been duly audited and approved according to law and have not been paid because of the lapsing or insufficiency of former appropriations against which the claims were chargeable or the lack of an appropriate procurement document in place, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2225 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 293 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 293 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 106) |
2022-03-29 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-29 | House | received in House |
2022-03-25 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-0 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2022-03-22 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2022-03-22 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | 1st reading |
2022-03-21 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 89-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-04 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-02-28 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-28 | House | introduced in House |