KY HB590 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 161.048 to require 6 or more years of honorable service for a veteran of the Armed Forces to receive certification through the Education Professional Standards Board's alternative certification program; amend KRS 161.155 to allow the transfer of sick leave for a school district employee who changes employment to the Education Professional Standards Board.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Education Professional Standards Board.
Sponsors
Rep. John Carney [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 410 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2018-03-21 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-03-16 | House | posted in committee |
2018-03-01 | House | to Education (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB590.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB590/bill.pdf |
Roll Call | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB590/vote_history.pdf |