KY HB570 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 98)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 98)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 65.220, establishing the purpose of KRS 65.210 to 65.300, to allow public agencies to participate in Interlocal agreements; amend KRS 65.230 to define "interlocal agency," "local government," and "public agency"; create a new section of KRS 65.210 to 65.300 to set protocols for establishing an interlocal agreement; amend KRS 65.240 to establish that an interlocal agreement may be for sharing revenues, add certain utilities to the list subject to an interlocal agreement, and outline purposes for which schools may enter into agreements; amend KRS 65.242 to require agreements amended only to adjust participating parties, that the agreement be sent to the Secretary of State rather than to the Department for Local Government and the Attorney General; amend KRS 65.250 to specify the contents of the agreements themselves; create a new section of KRS 65.210 to 65.300 to specify the powers exercised by interlocal agencies; amend KRS 65.255 to make technical corrections to the authority of peace officers exercising powers outside their immediate jurisdiction; amend KRS 65.260 make technical changes and specify when the Attorney General and the Department for Local Government reviews agreements, and to establish a deadline for review; amend KRS 65.270 to specify the execution and sale of bonds by public agencies and remove language dealing with income pledging for bond issuance; amend KRS 65.290 to no longer require agreements to be filed with county clerks and provide that no additional filings are require for the addition or removal of parties to the agreement; amend KRS 65.300 to make technical corrections; amend KRS 68.200, 154.22.040, and 154.32.050 to conform; add a non-codified section to specify that amendments to the Act do not invalidate interlocal agreements entered into prior to the effective date of the Act; repeal KRS 65.245 and 65.280.
Title
AN ACT relating to interlocal cooperation agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1464 (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 244 (Y: 73 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 244 (Y: 73 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-24 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 98) |
2020-04-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-04-15 | House | received in House |
2020-04-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 17-16 |
2020-04-14 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-04-14 | Senate | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2020-04-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, April 14, 2020 |
2020-03-26 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2020-03-19 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | 1st reading |
2020-03-19 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-17 | House | 3rd reading, passed 73-10 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (2) |
2020-03-17 | House | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-03-12 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-09 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-04 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Attorney General
Cities
Counties
County Clerks
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Higher
Local Government
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County
Public Authorities
Public Officers and Employees
Special Districts
Special Purpose Governmental Entities
State Agencies
Cities
Counties
County Clerks
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Higher
Local Government
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County
Public Authorities
Public Officers and Employees
Special Districts
Special Purpose Governmental Entities
State Agencies