KY HB542 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-22 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-22 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 116 to direct the Department of Fish and Wildlife Resources to incorporate an application for voter registration with a hunting license or permit.
Title
AN ACT relating to voter registration.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Robert Damron [D] | Rep. Charlie Hoffman [D] | Rep. Terry Mills [D] |
Rep. Sannie Overly [D] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Jody Richards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-03-18 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-18 | 3rd reading, passed 96-2 | |
2010-03-17 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 18, 2010 | |
2010-03-17 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-16 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-03-04 | posted in committee | |
2010-03-02 | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) | |
2010-02-26 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB542.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB542/bill.doc |