KY HB529 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 23 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 23 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 151.100 to 151.460 to establish the 11-member Kentucky Water Resources Board; set initial appointments and identify the role and function of the board in developing water resource policy; attach the board to the Energy and Environment Cabinet for administrative purposes; require the cabinet to provide staff to the board; amend KRS 151.110 to include agriculture in the list of reasons water resources have become of vital importance to the Commonwealth; require the cabinet to provide leadership for on-farm and rural community drought and water assessment monitoring, and improvements for agricultural purposes; and authorize the cabinet to receive and disperse federal, state, and other funds for on-farm and community drought and water assessment, monitoring, and improvements.
Title
AN ACT relating to water resources policy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | House | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2016-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2016-03-23 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2016-03-22 | House | received in House |
2016-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2016-03-18 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 21, 2016 (Consent Orders #2) |
2016-03-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-11 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2016-03-07 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2016-03-03 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 7, 2016 |
2016-03-03 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-02 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-01 | House | posting waived |
2016-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2016-03-01 | House | to Agriculture & Small Business (H) |
2016-02-29 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB529.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB529/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB529/vote_history.pdf |