KY HB494 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 88)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 88)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establish Subtitle 12 of KRS Chapter 286 and create sections thereof to make findings; define terms; establish licensing requirements for certain student education loan servicers; establish records requirements for student education loan servicers; require annual and other reports by student education loan servicers; require student education loan servicers to pay an annual assessment fee; prohibit student education loan servicers from engaging in abusive acts and practices and prohibit other conduct; require student education loan servicers to comply with federal and state law; permit the commissioner to conduct examinations and investigations of student education loan servicers; establish requirements for conditioning, denying, suspending, or revoking the license of a student education loan servicers; establish regulatory provisions relating to emergency orders, administrative complaints, and appeals; establish penalties; amend KRS 452.005 to conform; state that provisions of the Act shall be severable; provide that Act may be cited as the Student Education Loan Servicing, Licensing, and Protection Act of 2022.
Title
AN ACT relating to student education loan servicing.
Sponsors
Rep. Deanna Frazier Gordon [R] | Rep. Bart Rowland [R] | Rep. Norma Kirk-McCormick [R] | Rep. Patti Minter [D] |
Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 453 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2266 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 255 (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 254 (Y: 26 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2266 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 255 (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 254 (Y: 26 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 88) |
2022-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-30 | House | passed 93-0 |
2022-03-30 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-29 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-29 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | to Rules (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | received in House |
2022-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2022-03-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-2 with Floor Amendment (2) |
2022-03-09 | House | floor amendment (2) filed |
2022-02-25 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 28, 2022 |
2022-02-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-23 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2022-02-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2022-02-14 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-14 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Banks and Financial Institutions
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Federal Laws and Regulations
Fees
General Assembly
Licensing
Loans and Credit
Reports Mandated
Short Titles and Popular Names
State Agencies
Banks and Financial Institutions
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Federal Laws and Regulations
Fees
General Assembly
Licensing
Loans and Credit
Reports Mandated
Short Titles and Popular Names
State Agencies