KY HB48 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-07 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-07 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 141 to establish a refundable income tax credit for the costs of mitigating noise from a commercial airport for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2020, but before January 1, 2024; amend KRS 131.190 to conform; amend KRS 141.0205 to order the credit.
Title
AN ACT relating to tax credits for airport noise mitigation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-07 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-09-09 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |