KY HB479 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 15.020 to authorize the Attorney General to bring an action regarding the constitutionality of statutes, regulations, and orders; establish venue; amend KRS 15.060 to authorize assistance from other areas of state government regarding investigations and prosecutions of various matters; amend KRS 15.113 to identify additional illegal or fraudulent activity under the investigative authority of the Attorney General; amend KRS 15.240 to expand the statutes under which the Attorney General can initiate an action or intervene in an action; amend KRS 342.760 and 342.765 to transfer the legal representation and reporting requirements regarding the uninsured employers fund from the Attorney General to the Labor Cabinet; amend KRS 446.350 to establish a waiver of sovereign immunity under limited situations; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to legal actions involving the Commonwealth of Kentucky and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. John Blanton [R] | Rep. DJ Johnson [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-24 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2021-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-11 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2021-02-10 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-10 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Attorney General
Civil Actions
Criminal Procedure
Effective Dates, Emergency
Labor and Industry
Workers' Compensation
Attorney General
Civil Actions
Criminal Procedure
Effective Dates, Emergency
Labor and Industry
Workers' Compensation
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/21RS/hb479.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/21RS/hb479/orig_bill.pdf |