KY HB446 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 132)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 132)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 620.140 to require a list to be provided to the cabinet by a biological or legal parent of potential persons to be considered as a relative or fictive kin placement; amend KRS 620.290 to add new requirements for local citizen foster care review boards to consider when making recommendations and remove requirements related to case reviews of when a foster child is moved more than three times; amend KRS 620.320 to change the duties of the State Citizen Foster Care Review Board; amend KRS 620.360 to establish that foster parent certification shall be effective for a minimum of three years; amend KRS 625.060 to establish that a foster parent shall be a party in an action for involuntary termination of parental rights; amend 625.090 to establish a new consideration by a court in cases of involuntary termination of parental rights that if a child is found to have been diagnosed with neonatal abstinence syndrome at the time of birth and the child's birth mother has had a child previously diagnosed with neonatal abstinence syndrome at the time of birth; establish a new consideration by a court in termination of parental rights cases that if a child has been removed from the biological or legal parents more than 2 times by the cabinet or a court.
Title
AN ACT relating to child welfare.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 968 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 223 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 223 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 132) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-13 | House | received in House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2019-03-06 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-01 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as consent bill |
2019-02-26 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-25 | House | returned to Health and Family Services (H) |
2019-02-25 | House | 1st reading |
2019-02-25 | House | taken from Health and Family Services (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2019-02-19 | House | introduced in House |