KY HB402 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - WITHDRAWN
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - WITHDRAWN
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 336 to provide that an employee shall have a right to carry pepper spray on their person for self protection and provide an exception for correctional facility employers.
Title
AN ACT relating to employee rights.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Thomas Burch [D] | Rep. Keith Hall [D] | Rep. Richard Henderson [D] |
Rep. Martha King [D] | Rep. Mary Marzian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | WITHDRAWN | |
2010-02-24 | WITHDRAWN | |
2010-02-24 | WITHDRAWN | |
2010-02-24 | WITHDRAWN | |
2010-02-11 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-10 | to Labor & Industry (H) | |
2010-02-09 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB402.htm |