KY HB395 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - posted in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - posted in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of Subtitle 17A of KRS Chapter 304-17 to permit patients who suffer from chronic illnesses, in consultation with their medical providers, to elect a day of the month to purchase all of their medications; create a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to require the Department for Medicaid Services to permit medication synchronization when part of a plan between provider, patient, and pharmacist.
Title
AN ACT relating to synchronization of prescription refills.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | posted in committee |
2014-03-25 | House | posting waived |
2014-03-17 | House | posted in committee |
2014-03-11 | House | recommitted to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-18 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB395.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB395/bill.doc |
Amendment | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB395/HCS1.doc |