KY HB376 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-24 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-24 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 141 to establish a qualified conservation contribution income tax credit; amend KRS 141.0205 to provide for the ordering of the credit; amend KRS 146.560 to include the Kentucky Heritage Land Conservation Fund Board in the development of qualification for certification of qualified real property interests; amend KRS 262.908 to include the PACE board in the development of qualifications for certification of qualified real property interests.
Title
AN ACT relating to tax credits promoting land conservation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-20 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 21, 2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-18 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-12 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | introduced in House |