KY HB359 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 439.3405 to establish the procedure for the recommendation of medical parole and associated Parole Board hearings.
Title
AN ACT relating to parole.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2010-03-04 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-03 | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 | |
2010-02-25 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 3, 2010 | |
2010-02-25 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-24 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-02-22 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-03 | to Judiciary (H) | |
2010-02-02 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB359.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB359/bill.doc |