KY HB351 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 91)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 138.130 to define terms for taxes on tobacco products; amend KRS 138.140 to increase the surtax on cigarettes and the excise tax on chewing tobacco, snuff, and tobacco products effective July 1, 2020; impose an excise tax on vapor products effective July 1, 2020; remove exemption for modified risk tobacco products; amend KRS 138.143 to impose a floor stock tax on cigarettes, all forms of tobacco products, and vapor products; amend KRS 141.0401 to increase the minimum limited liability entity tax to $225, currently $175; apply increase in limited liability entity tax to taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2020; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to governmental operations and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1454 (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 374 (Y: 57 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 333 (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs2, scta1 RSN# 1431 (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 192 (Y: 57 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 191 (Y: 37 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15Senatedelivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 91)
2020-04-15Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-04-15Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-04-15Senatereceived in House
2020-04-15Housebill passed 24-9
2020-04-15Houseveto overridden in Senate
2020-04-15Houseposted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
2020-04-15Houseto Rules (S)
2020-04-15Housereceived in Senate
2020-04-15Senatebill passed 57-32
2020-04-15Senateveto overridden in House
2020-04-15Senateposted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
2020-04-15Senatetaken from Rules
2020-04-14Senateto Rules (H)
2020-04-14Senateveto message received in House
2020-04-13Houseline items vetoed
2020-04-01Housedelivered to Governor
2020-04-01Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-04-01Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-04-01Housepassed 68-22
2020-04-01HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (2) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-04-01Houseplaced in the Orders of the Day for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (2) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-04-01Housetaken from Rules (H)
2020-04-01Houseto Rules (H)
2020-04-01Housereceived in House
2020-04-01Senatepassed 20-8-5 with Committee Substitute (2) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-04-01SenateCommittee Substitute (1) withdrawn
2020-04-01Senate3rd reading
2020-04-01Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, April 1, 2020
2020-04-01Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-04-01Senaterecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2020-04-01Senatetaken from Rules (S)
2020-03-19Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-18Senatereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2020-03-18Senate2nd reading
2020-03-18Senatetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2020-03-17Senatereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2020-03-17Senate1st reading
2020-03-17Senatetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2020-03-11Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2020-03-09Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-06House3rd reading, passed 57-34 with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-06Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-03-05Houseplaced in the Orders of the Day
2020-03-05Housetaken from Rules (H)
2020-03-05Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-03Housereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2020-03-03House1st reading
2020-03-03Housetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2020-02-05Houseposted in committee
2020-01-29Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2020-01-28Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback