KY HB342 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 106)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 218A to require that all prescriptions for controlled substances be submitted electronically except for certain conditions; require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to promultate administrative regulations; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to electronic prescribing of controlled substances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 358 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1003 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 217 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 106)
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Housepassed 93-0
2019-03-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-14Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-14Houseto Rules (H)
2019-03-14Housereceived in House
2019-03-14Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-14Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019
2019-03-13Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-12Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-07Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2019-03-05Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-04House3rd reading, passed 98-0 with floor amendment (1)
2019-03-01Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 4, 2019
2019-03-01House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-28Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2019-02-28Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-26Houseposted in committee
2019-02-14Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2019-02-13Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback