KY HB321 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 113)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 113)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 186A.100 and 186A.105 to extend the term of temporary tags for motor vehicles from 30 to 60 days.
Title
AN ACT relating to documentation for property which has a Kentucky certificate of title.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 395 (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa1 scta1 RSN# 2130 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 87 (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa1 scta1 RSN# 2130 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 87 (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 113) |
2022-03-29 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-25 | House | passed 89-1 |
2022-03-25 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendment (1), and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-24 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendment (1), and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-16 | House | to Rules (H) |
2022-03-16 | House | received in House |
2022-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1), floor amendment (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 16, 2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-02-03 | House | 3rd reading, passed 65-0 |
2022-02-02 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 03, 2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-28 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2022-01-19 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-19 | House | introduced in House |