KY HB320 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 157)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 157)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends KRS 337.385 to establish a statute of limitations of three years for wage and hour violations; creates a new section of KRS Chapter 413 to establish a statute of limitations of three years for actions against an employer for wrongful discharge in violation of public policy and for a violation of KRS 344.030 to 344.110 or KRS 344.372; and amends KRS 454.210 to expand personal jurisdiction of courts over nonresidents.
Title
AN ACT relating to civil procedure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3071 (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 206 (Y: 76 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 206 (Y: 76 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 157) |
2024-04-05 | House | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-27 | House | received in House |
2024-03-27 | Senate | passed 29-7 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2024-03-27 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2) withdrawn |
2024-03-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-26 | Senate | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2024-03-26 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed |
2024-03-25 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2024-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2024-03-08 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 76-19 with Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendment (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-03-04 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-03-04 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 05, 2024 |
2024-02-29 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-28 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-02-16 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2024-01-22 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-22 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Civil Rights
Courts, Circuit
Labor and Industry
Personnel and Employment
Wages and Hours
Civil Rights
Courts, Circuit
Labor and Industry
Personnel and Employment
Wages and Hours