KY HB319 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - to Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - to Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend various sections in KRS Chapter 45A to expand and refine the list of entities included and excluded in definition of "contracting body"; allow the Government Contract Review Committee to determine the definition of "governmental emergency"; refine the definition of "memorandum of agreement"; correct references to universities and colleges and institutions of higher education; refine the definition of "personal service contract" to eliminate the professional skill or judgment requirement and specifically include contracts for personal or professional services and group health care for public employees and exempt certain health care and hospital contracts from postsecondary research institutions; allow the committee to establish a reporting schedule for exempt personal service contracts and memoranda of agreement; exempt contracts between postsecondary research institutions relating to hospital or health care services provided by the institution, but require reporting of such contracts; require committee review of all personal service contracts and memoranda of agreement in excess of $1,000,000, except for select contracts that are exempted; exempt contracts for $40,000 and under from the request for proposals process, but require three quotes when feasible, and state that determination of feasibility may be reviewed by the secretary of the Finance and Administration Cabinet or the committee; exempt contracts for $40,000 and under not requiring professional skill or judgment from routine review process, but require filing within 30 days for informational purposes; prohibit delegation of decision-making authority by secretary of the Finance and Administration Cabinet, except with respect to institutions of higher education that have elected to implement procurement procedures in accordance with statutory authority; delete the requirement for annual reports; delineate the powers of the committee.
Title
AN ACT relating to government contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | to Rules (H) |
2016-03-29 | House | received in House |
2016-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 39-0 with Committee Substitute (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | placed in the Consent Orders #1 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2016-03-28 | Senate | floor amendments (1-title) and (2) withdrawn |
2016-03-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2016-03-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-23 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | floor amendment (1-title) and (2) filed |
2016-03-07 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-1 |
2016-02-29 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for for Wednesday, March 2, 2016 |
2016-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-04 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-02 | House | to State Government (H) |
2016-02-01 | House | introduced in House |