KY HB303 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 80)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 80)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 367.4903 to redefine "operator," "Kentucky Contact Center," "approximate location," and "working day"; define "person," "positive response," "unique identification number" or "locate request number," "locator," "second notice," "tolerance zone," "untonable facility," and "work site contact"; amend KRS 367.4909 to require a positive response from operators of underground facilities; establish the timing of operator responses; amend KRS 367.4911 to provide excavator start dates, to include entities engaged in exempt activities to notify operators immediately upon discovery of damage to an underground facility, and to provide when mechanized equipment can be used in the tolerance zone; amend KRS 367.4913 to require contact centers to maintain certain locate request information for five years and to change the composition of the Kentucky Contact Center board of directors; amend KRS 369.4915 to require entities engaging in exempt activities to cease activity and notify an operator when an underground facility is damaged and to exempt certain noninvasive inspection and maintenance excavating for an existing utility pole; amend KRS 367.4917 to impose penalties on the employer if the violation is committed in the scope of employment and to provide that the Public Service Commission shall establish a written agreement form to deviate from the locate request dates provided for in the Underground Facility Damage Prevention Act of 1994; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2022.
Title
AN ACT relating to underground facility protection.
Sponsors
Rep. Sal Santoro [R] | Rep. Tina Bojanowski [D] | Rep. Kevin Bratcher [R] | Rep. Jonathan Dixon [R] |
Rep. Patrick Flannery [R] | Rep. Richard Heath [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 313 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa2 RSN# 1709 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 sfa2 RSN# 1704 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 125 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa2 RSN# 1709 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 sfa2 RSN# 1704 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 125 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 80) |
2021-03-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-15 | House | passed 92-0 |
2021-03-15 | House | House concurred in Senate floor amendment (2) |
2021-03-15 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendment (2) |
2021-03-15 | House | taken from Rules |
2021-03-12 | House | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-12 | House | received in House |
2021-03-12 | Senate | passed 31-0 with floor amendment (2) |
2021-03-12 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2021-03-12 | Senate | bill reconsidered |
2021-03-12 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with floor amendments (1) and (2) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2021-03-11 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2021-03-04 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-03 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-03-01 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with floor amendments (2) and (5) |
2021-02-24 | House | floor amendment (5) filed |
2021-02-23 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 24, 2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | floor amendments (1), (2), (3) and (4) filed |
2021-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-09 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-04 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
County Clerks
Effective Dates, Delayed
Energy
Environment and Conservation
Hazardous Materials
Information Technology
Local Government
Local Mandate
Oil and Natural Gas
Public Protection
Public Safety
Public Utilities
Safety
Sewer Systems
Technology
Telecommunications
Water Supply
Effective Dates, Delayed
Energy
Environment and Conservation
Hazardous Materials
Information Technology
Local Government
Local Mandate
Oil and Natural Gas
Public Protection
Public Safety
Public Utilities
Safety
Sewer Systems
Technology
Telecommunications
Water Supply