KY HB302 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-9)
Status: Passed on February 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-08 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 2)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-9)
Status: Passed on February 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-08 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 2)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Appropriate debt service and authorize agency bonds for the Department of Military Affairs to construct a hangar at Bluegrass Station; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to Bluegrass Station, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Rocky Adkins [D] | Rep. Johnny Bell [D] | Rep. Mike Cherry [D] | Rep. Larry Clark [D] |
Rep. Will Coursey [D] | Rep. Jesse Crenshaw [D] | Rep. Ron Crimm [R] | Rep. Robert Damron [D] |
Rep. Mitchel Denham [D] | Rep. Bob DeWeese [R] | Rep. Tim Firkins [D] | Rep. David Floyd [R] |
Rep. James Glenn [D] | Rep. Jeff Greer [D] | Rep. Charlie Hoffman [D] | Rep. Jeff Hoover [R] |
Rep. Joni Jenkins [D] | Rep. Thomas Kerr [R] | Rep. Martha King [D] | Rep. Jimmie Lee [D] |
Rep. Thomas McKee [D] | Rep. Harry Moberly [D] | Rep. Tim Moore [R] | Rep. Lonnie Napier [R] |
Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Don Pasley [D] | Rep. Tanya Pullin [D] | Rep. Rick Rand [D] |
Rep. Jody Richards [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] | Rep. Sal Santoro [R] | Rep. Dottie Sims [D] |
Rep. John Stacy [D] | Rep. Fitz Steele [D] | Rep. Kent Stevens [D] | Rep. Gregory Stumbo [D] |
Rep. Brent Yonts [D] | Rep. Jill York [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 2) | |
2010-02-04 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-02-04 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2010-02-04 | received in House | |
2010-02-04 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 | |
2010-02-04 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 4, 2010 | |
2010-02-04 | reported favorably, to Rules | |
2010-02-03 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2010-02-03 | 2nd reading | |
2010-02-03 | taken from committee | |
2010-02-02 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2010-02-02 | returned to Committee on Committees (S) | |
2010-02-02 | 1st reading | |
2010-02-02 | taken from committee | |
2010-02-01 | received in Senate | |
2010-01-28 | 3rd reading, passed 93-2 with Committee Substitute | |
2010-01-27 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 28, 2010 | |
2010-01-27 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-01-26 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-01-22 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-22 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2010-01-21 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB302.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB302/bill.doc |