KY HB290 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 159)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 159)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.370 to define terms; require a governing board of a public postsecondary education institution to adopt a code for student conduct, establish minimum procedural requirements for a nonacademic violation when the violation is punishable by a suspension, expulsion, or termination of student housing, including a presumption of innocence, written notice, maintenance of an administrative file, the right to be present and participate meaningfully, the right to fair and impartial treatment, and the ability to bring a support person; establish enhanced minimum procedural requirements for a nonacademic violation when the violation is punishable by a suspension of 3 days or more, expulsion, or termination of student housing, including the right to be represented by counsel, to present relevant hearing evidence, and to cross-examine hearing testimony; provide a respondent that is suspended for 3 days or more, expelled, or has their campus housing terminated the right to appeal the results of a disciplinary hearing; provide that a participant has the right to appeal a Title IX allegation that does not result in a finding of a violation; provide a respondent or designated complainant shall have the right to appeal a final order of the governing board in Circuit Court; provide that nothing in the section shall be interpreted to impede or delay law enforcement, impair an institution's ability to take reasonable interim measures in a student discipline matter, impair an institution's ability to effectuate a valid judicial order, impair an institution's ability to terminate a student's residence in campus housing for any other reason than a student disciplinary matter, or limit any addition rights afforded under Federal law; create a new section of KRS 164 to require a public postsecondary education institution to publish a report on student discipline every three years; establish the required contents of the report; permit a postsecondary education institution to apply to the Attorney General for an exemption when the institution maintains that required data cannot be adequately deidentified to conform to Federal Law; provide that the Act may be cited as the Kentucky Campus Due Process Protection Act.
Title
AN ACT relating to student discipline at public postsecondary education institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2289 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 286 (Y: 71 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 286 (Y: 71 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 159) |
2022-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-30 | House | received in House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 24-10 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-25 | Senate | reassigned to Judiciary (S) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | 1st reading |
2022-03-25 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 71-19 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-09 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 10, 2022 |
2022-02-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-02-15 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2022-01-13 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-13 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Education, Higher
Federal Laws and Regulations
Short Titles and Popular Names
Universities and Colleges
Federal Laws and Regulations
Short Titles and Popular Names
Universities and Colleges