KY HB273 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 116.055 to ensure that any qualified voter who voluntarily removes his or her name from the voter registration list after December 31 and who subsequently wishes to register to vote prior to the next scheduled primary, shall not be considered as a "newly registered voter" for purposes of party eligibility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to voter registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 752 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 219 (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26Housevetoed
2018-04-14Housedelivered to Governor
2018-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-04-14Housereceived in House
2018-04-14Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0
2018-04-13Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2018-04-02Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2018-03-29Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, April 2, 2018
2018-03-27Senatereported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill
2018-03-20Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2018-03-20Senate2nd reading
2018-03-20Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2018-03-19Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2018-03-19Senate1st reading
2018-03-19Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2018-03-07Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2018-03-06Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-05House3rd reading, passed 84-5 with Committee Substitute
2018-03-02Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 5, 2018
2018-02-27House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-26Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-02-20Houseposted in committee
2018-02-01Houseto Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2018-01-30Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback