KY HB260 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 132.191 to expand the requirements for using the income approach and sales comparison approach in the valuation of property; establish additional requirements for the appraisal of real property; amend KRS 133.120 to change the qualifications of taxpayer representatives who receive compensation for appealing property assessments.
Title
AN ACT relating to property assessments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 346 (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-21 | House | passed 66-24 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) |
2022-03-21 | House | floor amendment (2) defeated |
2022-03-21 | House | floor amendment (3) ruled not germane |
2022-03-21 | House | 3rd reading |
2022-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 08, 2022 |
2022-03-03 | House | floor amendments (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-02 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-02 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-01 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-02-18 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-01-10 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-10 | House | introduced in House |