KY HB252 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-27 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-27 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 158.162 to require the school council or, if none exists, the principal to obtain an automated external defibrillator by the 2019-2020 school year; require a minimum of three employees be trained on its usage; require the school council or, if none exists, the principal to adopt procedures for its usage and policies on training and maintenance; amend KRS 158.302 to delete language stating that a school is not required to have an automated external defibrillator.
Title
AN ACT relating to automated external defibrillators in schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-24 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-2 with Committee Substitute |
2017-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 24, 2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2017-02-17 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-09 | House | to Education (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | introduced in House |