KY HB235 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-19 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-19 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.011 to require new appointees to the council to complete orientation and education program to be eligible for a second term; amend KRS 164.020 to direct the Council on Postsecondary Education (CPE) to develop orientation and education program for new governing board members of the council, public universities, and Kentucky Community and Technical College System (KCTCS); require that hte program include six hours of instruction time with specific information and be delivered within one year of a new member's appointment; require an annual report listing new board members not completing the program; invite board members of private colleges and universities to participate; authorize the CPE to develop continuing education programs for all governing board members of public institutions and to review and approve orientation programs for governing boards of each public university and KCTCS; amend KRS 164.131 to require appointed and elected governing board members of the University of Kentucky to complete an orientation and education program to be eligible for a second term; amend KRS 164.321 to require appointed and elected governing board members of the comprehensive public universities and KCTCS to complete an orientation and education program to be eligible for a second term; amend KRS 164.821 to require appointed and elected governing board members of the University of Louisville to complete an orientation and education program to be eligible for a second term.
Title
AN ACT relating to governance of postsecondary education institutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2015-02-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 80-18 |
2015-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 12, 2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-02-05 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-05 | House | to Education (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | introduced in House |