KY HB234 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 142)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 142)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 350.055 to change the reference in the public notice of intention to mine coal from "mining site" to "permitted area"; amend KRS 350.060 to remove the requirement that all areas overlying underground workings of coal mines be permitted.
Title
AN ACT relating to coal mining.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Gooch [R] | Rep. John Blanton [R] | Rep. Suzanne Miles [R] | Sen. Robert Mills [R] |
Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 142) |
2017-03-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-15 | House | received in House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-2 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2017-03-07 | Senate | returned to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | taken from Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | returned to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | taken from Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2017-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 23, 2017 |
2017-02-17 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2017-02-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-14 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-09 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | introduced in House |