KY HB214 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 129)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 129)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 23A.020 to move Edmonson County from the 38th Judicial Circuit into the 8th Judicial Circuit; amend KRS 23A.040 (Effective January 2, 2023) to add the 56th Judicial Circuit to the list of judicial circuits with 2 Circuit Judges; amend KRS 23A.045 (Effective January 2, 2023) to remove the 3rd, 6th, 14th, and 27th Judicial Circuits from the list of judicial circuits with 3 Circuit Judges; amend KRS 23A.050 to add the 3rd, 6th, 14th, and 27th Judicial Circuits to the list of judicial circuits with 4 Circuit Judges; create KRS 23A.052 to establish that the 8th and 25th Judicial Circuits shall be entitled to 5 Circuit Judges; amend KRS 23A.055 to establish that the 16th Judicial Circuit shall be entitled to 6 Circuit Judges; amend KRS 24A.030 (Effective January 2, 2023) to move Edmonson County from the 38th Judicial District into the 8th Judicial District, move Russell and Wayne Counties from the 40th Judicial District into the 57th Judicial District, move Nelson County from the 57th Judicial District into the 58th Judicial District, move Cumberland and Monroe Counties from the 59th Judicial District into the 40th Judicial District, move Marshall County from the 58th Judicial District into the 42nd Judicial District, and eliminate the 59th Judicial District; amend KRS 24A.050 to remove the 4th, 31st, 38th, 41st, and 51st Districts from the list of Judicial Districts with 2 District Judges; amend KRS 24A.090 to remove 1 District Court division of the 16th Judicial District; request that the Circuit Court Judges added under KRS 23A.050 in the 3rd, 6th, 14th, 16th, and 27th Judicial Circuits be designated as family court divisions with an effective date of January 2, 2023; request that the District Court judgeships eliminated in the 4th, 13th, 31st, 41st, 51st, and the realignment of the Judicial Districts take effect January 1, 2027, unless a vacancy occurs earlier; provide transitional language; EFFECTIVE in part January 2, 2023, and January 1, 2027; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to judicial districts and circuits and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. DJ Johnson [R] | Rep. Jason Nemes [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] | Rep. Jason Petrie [R] |
Rep. Tom Smith [R] | Rep. Walker Thomas [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 440 (Y: 78 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2251 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 186 (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2251 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 186 (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 129) |
2022-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-29 | House | passed 78-12 |
2022-03-29 | House | House concurred in Senate Floor Amendment (2) |
2022-03-29 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendment (2) |
2022-03-29 | House | taken from Rules |
2022-03-29 | House | to Rules (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | received in House |
2022-03-29 | Senate | passed 25-11 with Floor Amendment (2) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2022-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2022-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2022-03-23 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2022-03-23 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2022-03-23 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | 1st reading |
2022-03-22 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-02-28 | House | 3rd reading, passed 73-23 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-02-28 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-02-22 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2022-02-15 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-15 | House | 1st reading |
2022-02-15 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Courts, Circuit
Courts, District
Courts, Family
Effective Dates, Delayed
Effective Dates, Emergency
Elections and Voting
Judicial Circuits
Judicial Districts
Secretary of State
Courts, District
Courts, Family
Effective Dates, Delayed
Effective Dates, Emergency
Elections and Voting
Judicial Circuits
Judicial Districts
Secretary of State