KY HB166 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 211 to define "SUDEP" and encourage a health care provider to provide information regarding sudden unexpected death in epilepsy; create a new section of KRS Chapter 72 to define "SUDEP" and update autopsy requirements; provide that the Act may be cited as Jami's Law.
Title
AN ACT relating to sudden unexpected death in epilepsy.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Nemes [R] | Rep. Danny Bentley [R] | Rep. Steve Bratcher [R] | Rep. Alan Gentry [D] |
Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Scott Sharp [R] | Rep. Pamela Stevenson [D] | Rep. Wade Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3127 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 79 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 79 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-1 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment (2) and Floor Amendment (1-title) withdrawn |
2024-03-27 | Senate | floor amendments (1-title) and (2) filed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-26 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2024-03-14 | Senate | to Health Services (S) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-06 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-02 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 05, 2024 |
2024-02-02 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-01 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-01-24 | House | to Health Services (H) |
2024-01-05 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-05 | House | introduced in House |